tag:blogger.com,1999:blog-14248347916218248922014-10-03T00:09:53.148-07:00MathsWelcome! This blog is dedicated to all Maths lovers who would like to improve their maths skill. You will find the content covering multiplication in Maths without using the calculator otherwise it is called as a mental maths. It is hope you will keep in touch with your maths tricks constantly and stun your friends at the same time.kamalhttp://www.blogger.com/profile/18279147111181655068noreply@blogger.comBlogger4125tag:blogger.com,1999:blog-1424834791621824892.post-37332438826352281602008-04-07T22:47:00.000-07:002008-09-04T07:21:57.370-07:00Inside AdSense: Another look at optimizations<a href="http://adsense.blogspot.com/2008/03/another-look-at-optimizations.html#links">Inside AdSense: Another look at optimizations</a>kamalhttp://www.blogger.com/profile/18279147111181655068noreply@blogger.com1tag:blogger.com,1999:blog-1424834791621824892.post-64683603290466829512008-03-31T06:15:00.000-07:002008-08-07T06:46:37.284-07:00mathstricksLearn mathstricks for free in your part time<br /><br />part time and full time readers are welcome learn the mathtricks and stun your friends and families on your part time.<br /><br />Have you heard about part time learning. This blog will help you in part time learning of maths multiplication.<br /><br />Hi everybody now a days the maths calculation are not without calculator or computer think about your kids in the future without calculator they can't do anything else in order to avoid that please teach some mentalmaths or mathstricks to help them in the furture for eassy calculations.<br />hope you are ready to learn the mathstricks for free.let us start this week with the mathstricks how the number 11 can be multiplied with other two or three digit numbers. Let me start with the example 143 X 11 = ? Please don’t use the calculator because your brain itself a calculator!!!. Just follow the steps below to multiply the numbers.<br />43 X 11<br />4 3write the number as shown in above fig 4 space 3 ok now add the numbers (4+3) = 7write the 7 in the middle of the numbers 4 and 3<br />4 7 3<br />that’s it !! 43 X 11 = 473 (now check the answer with the calculator) wow !!<br />ok if you got the number like this 59 X 11 don’t worry use the same method as above said<br />5 9<br />(5 + 1)4 9<br />6 4 9<br />Now add the number (5+9) = 14 don’t place the 14 directly in the middleJust carry over 1 and add with 5 ie (5+1) = 6 so now the answer is 59 X 11 = 649<br />visit this page for regular mathstricks updates.<br />mathstricks is the way to learnmathematics without using any calculator or computer once if you are familiar with the mentalmaths things are very easy to do. Learn mathstricks for your future.<br />start learning mathstricks on your part time for free.stun your friends with amazing mathstricks on your part time. teach them and start earning on your part time.<br />Try<br />35 X 11 ; 82 X 11; 98 X 311<br />See you with more updates soon!!!!!!!!!!kamalhttp://www.blogger.com/profile/18279147111181655068noreply@blogger.com1tag:blogger.com,1999:blog-1424834791621824892.post-64578352531284939452008-03-30T23:01:00.000-07:002008-03-30T23:01:59.577-07:00Inside AdSense: Google closes DoubleClick acquisition<a href="http://adsense.blogspot.com/2008/03/google-closes-doubleclick-acquisition.html">Inside AdSense: Google closes DoubleClick acquisition</a>kamalhttp://www.blogger.com/profile/18279147111181655068noreply@blogger.com0tag:blogger.com,1999:blog-1424834791621824892.post-25587375086774521132008-03-16T23:49:00.000-07:002008-03-30T00:58:35.400-07:00<div align="center"><strong>Thanks for visiting Our page</strong></div><div align="center"><br /><strong>Learn maths for free.</strong></div><div align="left"><strong></strong></div><div align="justify"><br /><br /><br />Hi Everybody hope you are visiting to this page regularly now for this week let us listen to Multiply the numbers in more simple ways.<br /><br />Let me start with the Base numbers and complement numbers . The base numbers are denoted as 10, 100, 1000, 10000 etc., and the complement numbers are the difference between the base numbers and the actual numbers for eg., the base number for this digit 4 is 10 and the complement number for this digit is 6 ie., (10 -4 = 6).<br /><br />Please keep the above said paragraph in your mind always and just follow me.<br /><br />Let us multiply 8 X 9<br /><br />The base number for 8 is 10 so (8 – 10 = -2 )<br />The base number for 9 is 10 so (9-10) = -1)<br /><br />Now write the number like this<br /><br />8 -2<br />9 -1<br /><br />72<br /><br />Multiply first (-2 X -1 = 2) this is final number in the answer<br />Then subtract any one number on diagonal wise (8-1 = 7) or (9-2=7)<br />Now we got the answer. Ok here is the another example<br /><br />Let us try 98 X 97 (can u multiply in 6 second ohh yes !!!)<br /><br /><br />98 -02<br /><br />97 -03<br /><br />-----------<br />98-3 06<br /><br />answer 9506 check with the calculator now and make sure the answer is correct<br /><br />See you with more updates.</div><div align="justify"><br /> </div>kamalhttp://www.blogger.com/profile/18279147111181655068noreply@blogger.com0